Robbins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Lisa Lynne Robbins
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00418
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shata Stucky on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Stucky, Shata)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lisa Lynne Robbins re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/18/2021. (alw)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Lisa Lynne Robbins This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW Complaint (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2293820.), filed by Lisa Lynne Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Lynne Robbins
Represented By: Mark B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Represented By: Shata Stucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?