Herrington v. Gritman Medical Center
Plaintiff: Ashley Herrington
Defendant: Gritman Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv00437
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Shantel Grande on behalf of Gritman Medical Center (Grande, Alexandra)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 1/11/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/19/2022 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd)
December 28, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2022 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale.), ***Deadlines terminated. (jd)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ORDER VACATING the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for January 13, 2022, and RESETTING the Telephonic Scheduling Conference to January 19, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. (MT). The parties are directed to file their joint litigation plan and discovery plan on or before January 11, 2022. The parties shall call in for the Telephonic Scheduling Conference as directed in the #3 Litigation Order. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Gritman Medical Center, Ashley Herrington re #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/14/2022. (alw)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gritman Medical Center. (Bennett, A.)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gritman Medical Center.(Bennett, A.)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Herrington (Attachments: #1 Service Information Sheet Personal Return of Service)(Bolton, K.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gritman Medical Center. (Print attached Summons for service.) (kt)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2022 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before January 6, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Bolton, K.)
November 12, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Ashley Herrington is missing Civil Cover Sheet. Please file. (alw)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gritman Medical Center against Ashley Herrington ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2302160.), filed by Ashley Herrington. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bolton, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrington v. Gritman Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Herrington
Represented By: K. Jill Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gritman Medical Center
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Alexandra Shantel Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?