Rehms v. City of Post Falls Police Department, et al.
Plaintiff: Corrie M. Rehms
Defendant: Post Falls Police Department, City of Post Falls, City of Coeur d' Alene, Coeur d'Alene Police Department, Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight, Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen, Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson, Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White, Officer Nick Knoll, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, John/Janes 1-10 Does, River City Animal Hospital PLLC, John and Jane Does 11-13, Post Falls Prosecutors and John and Jane Does 14-15
Case Number: 2:2022cv00185
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by River City Animal Hospital PLLC identifying Corporate Parent VCA Animal Hospitals, Inc., Corporate Parent VCA Inc. for River City Animal Hospital PLLC. (Thielbahr, Meredith)
June 10, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Post Falls Prosecutors.(Nutsch, Sonyalee)
June 10, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonyalee R Nutsch on behalf of Post Falls Prosecutors (Nutsch, Sonyalee)
June 10, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Kootenai County Sheriff's Department served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Post Falls Police Department served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Post Falls Prosecutors served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. River City Animal Hospital PLLC served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Kootenai County served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Nick Knoll served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. City of Post Falls served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. City of Coeur d' Alene served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corrie M. Rehms. Coeur d'Alene Police Department served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Phelps, Douglas)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 15, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by City of Coeur d' Alene, City of Post Falls, Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White, Coeur d'Alene Police Department, Nick Knoll, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department, Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight, Post Falls Police Department, Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen, Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson.(Nutsch, Sonyalee)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department re #11 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/5/2022. (jd)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 DUPLICATE NOTICE of Appearance by Sonyalee R Nutsch on behalf of Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department (Nutsch, Sonyalee) Modified on 6/6/2022, please see dkt. #11 (jd).
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonyalee R Nutsch on behalf of Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department (Nutsch, Sonyalee)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Coeur d' Alene, City of Post Falls, Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White, Coeur d'Alene Police Department, Nick Knoll, Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight, Post Falls Police Department, Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen, Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson re #9 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/5/2022. (jd)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonyalee R Nutsch on behalf of City of Coeur d' Alene, City of Post Falls, Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White, Coeur d'Alene Police Department, Nick Knoll, Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight, Post Falls Police Department, Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen, Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson (Nutsch, Sonyalee)
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Corrie M. Rehms and counsel for River City Animal Hospital PLLC re #7 Notice of Appearance, #5 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/1/2022. (jd)
June 1, 2022 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith L Thielbahr on behalf of River City Animal Hospital PLLC (Thielbahr, Meredith)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Coeur d' Alene, City of Post Falls, Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White, Coeur d'Alene Police Department, John/Janes 1-10 Does, John and Jane Does 11-13, John and Jane Does 14-15, Nick Knoll, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger, Kootenai County Sheriff's Department, Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight, Post Falls Police Department, Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen, Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson, Post Falls Prosecutors, River City Animal Hospital PLLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Corrie M. Rehms.(jd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Cost BOND in the amount of $ $500.00 posted by Corrie M. Rehms. Receipt #1600. (jd)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Motion to Waive Bond (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Rehms shall secure and post a bond in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Idaho Code Section 6-610 within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Rehms shall officially file her Complaint (Dkt. [2-3]), and pay the associated filingfee (if she has not already done so), within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Bond Douglas Dwight Phelps appearing for Plaintiff Corrie Rehms. Responses due by 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Phelps, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2022: #3 Proposed Complaint) (jd).
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET re: Christoffer Christensen, City of Coeur d' Alene, City of Coeur d' Alene Police Department, City of Post Falls, City of Post Falls Police Department, John/Jane 11-13 Does, John/Jane 14-15 Does, John/Janes 1-10 Does, Pat Knight, Nick Knoll, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff Department, Lauren Pierson, Post Falls Prosecutors, River City Animal Hospital, Lee White, Ben Wolfinger ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2384413.), filed by Corrie Rehms. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Phelps, Douglas) Modified on 4/26/2022, to correct complaint to cover sheet (jd).
April 26, 2022 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:22-cv-00185-DCN. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehms v. City of Post Falls Police Department, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrie M. Rehms
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls Police Department
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Post Falls
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Coeur d' Alene
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coeur d'Alene Police Department
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls Chief of Police Pat Knight
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls Police Officer Christoffer Christensen
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls Police Officer Lauren Pierson
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coeur d'Alene Chief of Police Lee White
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nick Knoll
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Sheriff Ben Wolfinger
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Janes 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Animal Hospital PLLC
Represented By: David W Lloyd
Represented By: Meredith L Thielbahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 11-13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls Prosecutors
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Tully Patrick FitzMaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 14-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?