Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Petitioner: Jennie Louise Rivera
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2023cv00029
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (England, Christine)
February 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Triesch on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Triesch, Heidi)
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION. Plaintiffs In Forma PauperisApplication (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jennie Louise Rivera. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/10/2023. (alw)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. ((alw)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Jennie Louise Rivera This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Jennie Louise Rivera. Responses due by 2/9/2023 (Parkinson, Brad)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY , filed by Jennie Louise Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennie Louise Rivera
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: Heidi Triesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?