Ware v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brandy Lynn Ware
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2023cv00416
Filed: September 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Referring Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 Administrative Record by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco, Jr., to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
October 16, 2023 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Amanda K Brailsford for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:23-cv-00416-AKB. (jd)
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martin, Justin)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L Wucetich on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wucetich, Peter)
September 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Security, Brandy Lynn Ware re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/12/2023. (jd)
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION - Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 21, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Brandy Lynn Ware This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)
September 21, 2023 Filing 2 First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mark B Jones appearing for Petitioner Brandy Lynn Ware. Responses due by 10/12/2023 (Jones, Mark)
September 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY , filed by Brandy Lynn Ware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Lynn Ware
Represented By: Mark B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?