Morris et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al

Plaintiff: Alan C. Baker and Elizabeth Morris
Defendant: Thomas Bostick, John McHugh, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, John S. Kem and Andrew D. Kelly
Case Number: 3:2013cv00336
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Moscow - Central Office
County: Nez Perce - Central
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 14, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file their closing merits brief [ECF No. 56] is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their reply brief on or before 7/25/14. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 10, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER The motion to dismiss (docket no. 30 ) is DENIED. The motion for preliminary injunction (docket no. 4 ) is GRANTED. The Corps is enjoined from enforcing 36 C.F.R. § 327.13 as to law-abiding individuals possessing functional firearms on Corps-administered public lands for the purpose of self-defense. This preliminary injunction shall remain in force until further notice of the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 28, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The stay (docket nos. 25 & 27 ) is LIFTED and the motion for hearing (docket no. 23 ) is GRANTED. It is further ordered, that a hearing be held on the motion for preliminary injunction (docket no. 4 ) on 12/5/13 at 9:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bostick
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Kem
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Kelly
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan C. Baker
Represented By: Steven J Lechner
Represented By: James M Manley
Represented By: John L Runft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Morris
Represented By: James M Manley
Represented By: Steven J Lechner
Represented By: John L Runft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?