Ely v. Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund

Plaintiff: Donnie Ely
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Case Number: 3:2018cv00315
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Moscow - Central Office
County: Nez Perce - Central
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Brad P Miller appearing for Plaintiff Donnie Ely. Responses due by 10/4/2018 (Miller, Brad)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/18/2018 11:00 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/2/2018 11:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 9/25/2018. (at)
September 7, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery Kathleen M Keller appearing for Defendant Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Responses due by 9/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Keller, Kathleen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Kathleen M Keller appearing for Defendant Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Responses due by 9/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Keller, Kathleen)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund response due 8/23/2018. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #12 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kathleen M Keller for Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Donnie Ely re #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/8/2018. (jp)
August 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Keller. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1769931.)Marty Durand appearing for Defendant Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Responses due by 8/28/2018 (Durand, Marty)
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Marty Durand appearing for Defendant Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Responses due by 8/28/2018 (Durand, Marty)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Marshall Piotrowski on behalf of Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund (Piotrowski, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marty Durand on behalf of Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund (Durand, Marty)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donnie Ely re #1 Complaint, Exhibits 1-6; Civil Cover Sheet, Baker PHV Application, Order Approving Baker PHV Application, Issued Summons, Discovery Plan and Litigation Plan (Baker, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donnie Ely re #6 Litigation Order, Certificate of Service of Litigation Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference (Baker, James)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2018 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 9/11/18 the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #2 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James P. Baker for Donnie Ely. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Donnie Ely re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 to Complaint (ERISA). (Miller, Brad)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James P. Baker. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1761036.)Brad P Miller appearing for Plaintiff Donnie Ely. Responses due by 8/6/2018 (Miller, Brad)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (ERISA) against Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1761015.), filed by Donnie Ely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Summons, #10 Cover Sheet)(Miller, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely v. Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the PACE Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Represented By: Kathleen M Keller
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Ely
Represented By: Brad P Miller
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Represented By: James P. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?