Jackson v. Carlin

Plaintiff: Curtis Edward Jackson
Defendant: Carlin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00376
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (km)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (km)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Curtis Edward Jackson and counsel for Carlin re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/29/2018. (km)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (km)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Curtis Edward Jackson. (km)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Edward Jackson. (km)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Curtis Edward Jackson. Responses due by 9/19/2018 (km) Modified on 9/10/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Edward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?