Graham v. BuildASign LLC

Plaintiff: Harrell Guy Graham
Defendant: BuildASign LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00420
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process (Local Rule Civ 4.1) by Harrell Guy Graham. (Palmatier, Duncan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright number(s)VA-113-657, TX 1-021-884 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 10/2/2018) (cjs)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BuildASign LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BuildASign LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1793615.), filed by Harrell Guy Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ('657 Reg), #2 Exhibit B ('884 Reg), #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright)(Palmatier, Duncan) Modified on 10/2/2018 & 10/3/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. BuildASign LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrell Guy Graham
Represented By: Duncan Palmatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BuildASign LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?