Jameson v. University of Idaho
Plaintiff: Mairin Jameson
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF IDAHO, a public university and University of Idaho
Case Number: 3:2018cv00451
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The December 21, 2018 Telephonic Scheduling Conference is VACATED. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2019. Discovery due by 9/2/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/21/2019. Mediation shall take place by 10/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2019.). Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by Mairin Jameson re #11 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (O'Doherty, Shamus)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Mairin Jameson. (O'Doherty, Shamus)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Idaho Attorney General on 10/25/2018, filed by Mairin Jameson. (Cunningham, Brook)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Secretary of State on 10/24/2018, filed by Mairin Jameson. (Cunningham, Brook)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mairin Jameson. Replies due by 12/19/2018.(O'Doherty, Shamus)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shamus Tod O'Doherty on behalf of All Plaintiffs (O'Doherty, Shamus)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Peter C Erbland appearing for Defendant University of Idaho. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Erbland, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brook L. Cunningham for Mairin Jameson. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brook L. Cunningham. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1803010.)Troy Y Nelson appearing for Plaintiff Mairin Jameson. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Nelson, Troy)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 12/12/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 23, 2018 DISREGARD ENTRY (cjs) Modified on 10/23/2018 (cjs).
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to University of Idaho. (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
October 16, 2018 RECEIPT: Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # 0976-1799462. (km)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Idaho, filed by Mairin Jameson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jameson v. University of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mairin Jameson
Represented By: Brook L. Cunningham
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Represented By: Shamus Tod O'Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF IDAHO, a public university
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Idaho
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?