Howard v. Selene Finance LP

Plaintiff: LeAnna Howard
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00557
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement filed byKarin Rosalind Seubert on behalf of LeAnna Howard Related document: #8 Discovery Plan filed by LeAnna Howard. (Seubert, Karin)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held on 1/31/19. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/1/2019. ADR shall be held by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by LeAnna Howard. (Seubert, Karin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by LeAnna Howard re #5 Litigation Order, Stipulated. (Seubert, Karin)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's I.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Selene Finance LP.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Elijah Watkins, #2 Exhibit A to Watkins Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Watkins Declaration)(Watkins, Elijah)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's I.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by LeAnna Howard. Replies due by 1/22/2019.(Seubert, Karin)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 1/24/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selene Finance LP identifying Corporate Parent Selene Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures GP LLC for Selene Finance LP.. (Watkins, Elijah)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's I.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Defendant Selene Finance LP. Responses due by 1/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Elijah M. Watkins In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust)(Watkins, Elijah)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for LeAnna Howard, Selene Finance LP re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/17/2019. (alw)
December 19, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Selene Finance LP served on 12/18/2018. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
December 19, 2018 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge Winmill. Please use case number 3:18-cv-557-BLW for all future filings. (alw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the District Court of the Second Judicial District of the State of Idaho In and For the County of Clearwater, case number CV18-18-0415.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1825549.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Docket Sheet)(Watkins, Elijah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Selene Finance LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeAnna Howard
Represented By: Anne McLaughlin
Represented By: Karin Rosalind Seubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?