Moog et al v A - Z unnamed Defendants

Plaintiff: Therese J Moog and Mark R Moog
Defendant: A - Z unnamed Defendants
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ACCEPTING SECURITY AND FOR PUBLICATION AND STAY. The Court has reviewed the letter of undertaking and finds it is in proper form. Limitation Plaintiffs have filed also a stipulation for costs. (Dkt. #2 ). Provided these actions, the Court finds Limitation Plaintiffs have satisfied the requirements of 42 U.S.C. Section 30511 and Supplemental Rule F(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court accept the funds and letter of undertaking tendered to the Court as described above without prejudice to the right of any claimant to seek additional security under Supplemental Rule F(7). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due 3/21/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Christopher A Abel. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 29, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:19-cv-30-CWD (alw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher A. Abel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839725.)Gary L Montgomery appearing for Plaintiffs Mark R Moog, Therese J Moog. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Montgomery, Gary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Motion to Approve Security and for Publication and Stay re #1 Complaint, #2 Stipulation, #3 Stipulation Gary L Montgomery appearing for Plaintiffs Mark R Moog, Therese J Moog. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Order Accepting Security, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Order of Publication and Safety, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Notice of Complaint)(Montgomery, Gary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Mark R Moog, Therese J Moog. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking)(Montgomery, Gary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Costs by Mark R Moog, Therese J Moog. (Montgomery, Gary)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Action for exoneration from or limitation of liability against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1839116.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Montgomery, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moog et al v A - Z unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese J Moog
Represented By: Christopher A Abel
Represented By: Gary L Montgomery
Represented By: WIlliam A. M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark R Moog
Represented By: Christopher A Abel
Represented By: Gary L Montgomery
Represented By: WIlliam A. M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A - Z unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?