Buffington v. University of Idaho
Plaintiff: Kwasi Buffington
Defendant: University of Idaho
Case Number: 3:2019cv00115
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against University of Idaho, filed by Kwasi Buffington. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2)(alw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Kwasi Buffington. (alw)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against University of Idaho, filed by Kwasi Buffington.(bc)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kwasi Buffington. Responses due by 4/29/2019 (bc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #1 Earning Statement) (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffington v. University of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwasi Buffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?