Kolestani v. Carlin
Petitioner: Majid Kolestani and Nastaran Kolestani
Respondent: Terema Carlin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00129
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Majid Kolestani re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/17/2019. (jp) (cc: L. Anderson)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Majid Kolestani.(jp)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Majid Kolestani. (jp)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Majid Kolestani. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolestani v. Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Majid Kolestani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nastaran Kolestani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terema Carlin
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?