Grange Insurance Association v. Lautenschlager et al
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Association
Defendant: Dean Lautenschlager and Laura Lautenschlager
Case Number: 3:2019cv00153
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Grange Insurance Association re #1 Complaint, #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/20/2019. (jd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Krista T. McCarthy for Dean Lautenschlager and M. Justin Henry #9 for Laura Lautenschlager Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jd).
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Gabriel M. Haws appearing for Defendant Dean Lautenschlager. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Krista T. McCarthy in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Krista T. McCarthy, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Krista T. McCarthy, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Krista T. McCarthy, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Krista T. McCarthy)(Haws, Gabriel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Gabriel M. Haws appearing for Defendant Laura Lautenschlager. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Justin Henry in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Justin Henry, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Justin Henry, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Justin Henry, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Justin Henry, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Justin Henry, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Justin Henry, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Justin Henry)(Haws, Gabriel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by M. Justin Henry. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1900265.)Gabriel M. Haws appearing for Defendant Laura Lautenschlager. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Haws, Gabriel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Krista T. McCarthy. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1900125.)Gabriel M. Haws appearing for Defendant Dean Lautenschlager. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Haws, Gabriel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Insurance Association. Laura Lautenschlager served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Pope, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Insurance Association. Dean Lautenschlager served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Pope, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Grange Insurance Association. (Pope, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel shall comply with L.R.4.1 forthwith. (lc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dean Lautenschlager, Laura Lautenschlager. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Laura Lautenschlager)(cjs)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grange Insurance Association. (Pope, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1880573.), filed by Grange Insurance Association. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Pope, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Insurance Association v. Lautenschlager et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Lautenschlager
Represented By: Gabriel M. Haws
Represented By: Krista T. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lautenschlager
Represented By: Gabriel M. Haws
Represented By: M. Justin Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Association
Represented By: William G Pope
Represented By: William G. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?