Oakley, Inc. v. GNDJI LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: Karnail Singh, GNDJI LLC and Singh Karnail
Case Number: 3:2019cv00313
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert H Whaley
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakley, Inc.. Replies due by 10/18/2019.(Pedersen, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss J Nick Crawford appearing for Defendants GNDJI LLC, Singh Karnail. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Crawford, J)
September 9, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley. Please use case number 3:19-cv-00313-RHW on all future pleadings. (st)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc.. Singh Karnail served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc.. GNDJI LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GNDJI LLC and Singh Karnail. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 GNDJI LLC summons)(jd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakley, Inc.. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1925867.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons GNDJI Summons, #3 Summons Singh Summons)(Pedersen, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley, Inc. v. GNDJI LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karnail Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNDJI LLC
Represented By: Ryan Cody Janis
Represented By: J Nick Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Karnail
Represented By: Ryan Cody Janis
Represented By: J Nick Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth J Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?