Freedom Northwest Credit Union v. National Credit Union Administration
Plaintiff: Freedom Northwest Credit Union
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00351
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The stipulation filed by the parties in this case (Dkt. #4 ) is hereby APPROVED. Defendant shall have until November 8, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by National Credit Union Administration. (Woychick, Nicholas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Northwest Credit Union. (Creason, Samuel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Credit Union Administration. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1938762.), filed by FREEDOM NORTHWEST CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Creason, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Northwest Credit Union v. National Credit Union Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Northwest Credit Union
Represented By: Samuel Toevs Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?