State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Paddison
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Richard M. Paddison
Case Number: 3:2019cv00356
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 03:00 PM (Mountain Time) in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before NOVEMBER 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (alw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rossmiller, David)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Richard M. Paddison, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/30/2019. (alw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Richard M. Paddison served on 10/08/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Rossmiller, David) Modified on 10/29/2019 (hs).
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Richard M. Paddison.(Creason, Samuel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard M. Paddison. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Elissa M Boyd for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Elissa M. Boyd. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1940494.)David Phillip Rossmiller appearing for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Rossmiller, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard M. Paddison ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1940483.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rossmiller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Paddison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David Phillip Rossmiller
Represented By: Elissa M Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Paddison
Represented By: Samuel Toevs Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?