Hallson, et al. v. Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: JUDY R. HALLSON and MATTHEW H. HALLSON
Defendant: BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC., Doe Entities XI-XX and Doe Inc. I-X
Case Number: 3:2020cv00089
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE re #9 Notice of Hearing. With respect to the telephonic scheduling conference currently set for Monday, April 27, 2020 at 9:00 AM (PST): Hearing content provided via video conference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Non-parties may call the Court's public conference line of 1-888-808-6929 Access code 3648461 (no security code required), five minutes before the scheduled conference time. Case participants will be provided with separate call-in details by private email from the Court's staff to use for this video conference. (st)
March 23, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: The parties to exchange initial disclosures and file a notice with the Courtconfirming their compliance with this requirement, no later than 14 days beforethe telephonic scheduling conference. In this case, that means no later thanApril 13, 2020. (Per Notice, docket #9)(st)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: The parties to exchange initial disclosures and file a notice with the Court confirming their compliance with this requirement, no later than 14 days before the telephonic scheduling conference. In this case, that means no later than 4/13/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr.(st)
March 20, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. Please use case number 3:20-cv-00089-SM on all future pleadings. (st)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr from the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before April 20, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc., and to counsel for Judy R. Hallson and Matthew H. Hallson re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/24/2020. (jd)
February 24, 2020 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge Nye. Please use case number 3:20-cv-00089-DCN for all future filings. (jd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Docket. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service from Department of Insurance, #2 Summons in State Court, #3 Complaint in State Court, #4 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Diddle, Samuel)
February 24, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc. served on 2/21/2020. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
February 24, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and labeled the document name. Also the state court docket sheet scanned very lightly and is difficult to see. Please re-submit all state court filings as supplements and link to the notice of removal.(jd)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Todd Hodge re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC. . (Diddle, Samuel)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC.. (Diddle, Samuel)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC.. (Diddle, Samuel)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC. from Nez Perce 2nd District, case number CV35-19-1987.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2015117.), filed by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Diddle, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallson, et al. v. Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE, INC.
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities XI-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Inc. I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY R. HALLSON
Represented By: Darrel W Aherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW H. HALLSON
Represented By: Darrel W Aherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?