Eccles, et al. v. City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees, et al.
Plaintiff: Jason Eccles and Alexa Eccles
Defendant: Wayne Hollingshead, Bill Cone, City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees, Jan Johnson, City of Lewiston, Alan Nygaard and Andy Hanson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00119
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Lewiston, City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees, Bill Cone, Alexa Eccles, Jason Eccles, Andy Hanson, Wayne Hollingshead, Jan Johnson, Alan Nygaard re #1 Complaint, #7 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/26/2020. (jd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Kerley on behalf of All Defendants (Kerley, Christopher)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Eccles, Alexa Eccles. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Service Information Sheet, #2 Service Information Sheet, #3 Service Information Sheet, #4 Service Information Sheet, #5 Service Information Sheet, #6 Service Information Sheet)(Linscott, April)
March 17, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #5 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Alexa Eccles, Jason Eccles was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing as waiver of service summons.(jd)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 DISREGARD - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Eccles, Alexa Eccles. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Service Information Sheet, #2 Service Information Sheet, #3 Service Information Sheet, #4 Service Information Sheet, #5 Service Information Sheet, #6 Service Information Sheet)(Linscott, April) Modified on 3/17/2020, see corrective entry (jd).
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Bill Cone, #2 Andy Hanson, #3 Wayne Hollingshead, #4 Jan Johnson, #5 City of Lewiston, #6 Alan Nygaard)(jd)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/6/2020 11:30 AM MT Telephonic Hearing before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
March 9, 2020 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald Bush. Please use case number 3:20-cv-00119-REB for all future filings. (jd)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before April 29, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2020 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2022094.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees, #2 Summons Wayne Hollingshead, #3 Summons Bill Cone, #4 Summons Jan Johnson, #5 Summons Andy Hanson, #6 Summons City of Lewiston, #7 Summons Alan Nygaard, #8 Cover Sheet)(Linscott, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eccles, et al. v. City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hollingshead
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Cone
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lewiston Library Board of Trustees
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Johnson
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lewiston
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Nygaard
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hanson
Represented By: Christopher J Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Eccles
Represented By: April M Linscott
Represented By: Regina Michele McCrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Eccles
Represented By: April M Linscott
Represented By: Regina Michele McCrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?