Hall v. Monsanto Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Estate of Sherwood J. Hall, III and Janice S. Hall
Defendant: Monsanto Company and Does I-X
Case Number: 3:2020cv00244
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Transfer confirmation. (jd) Modified on 6/15/2020, received notification from the California Northern District that this case has been opened as case no. 3:20-cv-03827. (jd).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of California case No. 3:16-md-02741-VC MDL No. 2741. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER- CTO - 213. MDL NO. 2741 In re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation. (jd)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Janice S. Hall Regarding Potential Multidistrict Litigation Case (Larsen, Wes)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Wes S Larsen on behalf of Janice S. Hall (Larsen, Wes)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Janice S. Hall and to counsel for Monsanto Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/20/2020. (jd)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(5)(iii), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
May 21, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Monsanto Company served on 5/20/2020. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
May 21, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:20-cv-244-DCN. (jd)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Monsanto Company. (Hancock, Nicole)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hancock, Nicole)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company from Second Judicial District, Latah County, case number CV29-19-1027.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2050568.), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, ROA #2 Exhibit 2, Summons #3 Exhibit 3, Complaint #4 Exhibit 4, Declaration of Service #5 Exhibit 5, Probate of will #6 Exhibit 6, James Sherwood Hall, III obituary #7 Cover Sheet)(Hancock, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Monsanto Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sherwood J. Hall, III
Represented By: Darrel W Aherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice S. Hall
Represented By: Darrel W Aherin
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?