DiCianni, et al. v. Nez Perce County, et al.
Plaintiff: Grant DiCianni and Amanda DiCianni
Defendant: Don Beck, Nez Perce County, Doug Havens, Doug Zenner and Nez Perce County Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2020cv00253
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Richard C Tallman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Order entered on this date, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this entire action is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is also ordered closed. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - This action in its entirety is DISMISSED with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party must bear its own costs and fees. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order and Judgment, furnish copies to counsel, and close the case file. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 11, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Grant DiCianni. (Linscott, April)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL - Plaintiffs Violation of the Idaho Protection of Public Employee Act (IPPEA) claim against Defendant is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Amanda DiCianni is dismissed as a party to this action because she has no remaining causes of action under the operative complaint. Future captions in this matter must not include this dismissed party. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal by Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni. (Linscott, April)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment Bentley G Stromberg appearing for Defendant Nez Perce County. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel (Part 1), #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel (Part 2), #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel (Part 3), #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Counsel, #7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Counsel, #8 Exhibit D to Declaration of Counsel, #9 Exhibit E to Declaration of Counsel, #10 Exhibit F to Declaration of Counsel, #11 Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute)(Stromberg, Bentley)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni of Change of Fax Number (Linscott, April)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS NEZ PERCE COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, DON BECK, DOUG HAVENS, and DOUG ZENNER approving #17 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Nez Perce County Commissioners by Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni. (Linscott, April)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, based on the parties Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order Re: Expert Disclosures and Discovery Deadlines (Dkt. #15 ), the Courts Scheduling Order (Dkt. #9 ) at Paragraph 7 is modified. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #9 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Hearings,, to Modify Scheduling Order Re: Expert Disclosure and Discovery Deadlines by Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni. (Linscott, April)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL - A 5-day jury trial shall commence beginning on August 9, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. (PDT) in the United States Courthouse at Coeur d' Alene,Idaho. A pretrial conference shall be held on July 19, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. (PDT). The parties shall exchange witness lists on or before July 5, 2021. All exhibit lists, proposed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, trial briefs, and motions in limine shall be filed with the Court on or before July 5, 2021. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before June 21, 2021 that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard C. Tallman: Status Conference held on 12/29/2020. (Court Reporter/ESR n/a.) Hearing Not Recorded. (lp)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Video Status Conference set for 12/29/2020 09:00 AM in Video - Coeur d' Alene to Other (Pacific Time) before Judge Richard C. Tallman. The parties received a video link by separate notification. Members of the public may use the following to to attend this matter via Audio ONLY: 1-669-900-9128; Meeting ID: 859 9669 6566; Passcode: 352326. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition under federal law and Local rule 83.1 against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings.(lp)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE STATUS VIDEO CONFERENCE - Counsel for the parties are ordered to attend a case status videoconference on December 29, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. PST. Counsel must be prepared to advise the Court how the case will proceed based on the Scheduling Order previously entered by the Court on September 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard C. Tallman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Richard C. Tallman from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 30, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Tallman. Please use case number 3:20-cv-253-RCT on all future pleadings. (st)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) - IT IS SO ORDERED that telephonic schedulingconference on September 28, 2020 is VACATED. All dispositive motions shall be filed by May 28, 2021. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before November 27, 2020. ADR must be held by April 30, 2021. All factual discovery will be completed by April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by Don Beck, Doug Havens, Nez Perce County, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner re #6 Litigation Order, . (Stromberg, Bentley)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Don Beck, Doug Havens, Nez Perce County, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner. (Stromberg, Bentley)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before September 21, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned with a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
July 30, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:20-cv-00253-DCN. (jd)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Don Beck, Doug Havens, Nez Perce County, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner.(Stromberg, Bentley)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Don Beck, Amanda DiCianni, Grant DiCianni, Doug Havens, Nez Perce County, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/28/2020. (jd)
May 29, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Doug Havens, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner, Don Beck, Nez Perce County from Nez Perce County, case number CV35-20-0660.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2053860.), filed by Doug Havens, Nez Perce County Commissioners, Doug Zenner, Don Beck, Nez Perce County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Service Documents Attachment 1 - Case History Sheeet, #2 State Court Service Documents Attachment 2 - Summons Don Beck, #3 State Court Service Documents Attachment 3 - Summons Doug Havens, #4 State Court Service Documents Attachment 4 - Summons Nez Perce County, #5 State Court Service Documents Attachment 5 - Summons Doug Zenner, #6 State Court Complaint Attachment 6 - Complaint and Jury Demand, #7 State Court Service Documents Attachment 7 -Order Assigning Judge, #8 State Court Service Documents Attachment 8 - Order Regarding Disqualification, #9 State Court Service Documents Attachment 9 - Affidavit of Service Don Beck, #10 State Court Service Documents Attachment 10 - Affidavit of Service Doug Havens, #11 State Court Service Documents Attachment 11 - Affidavit of Service Nez Perce County, #12 State Court Service Documents Attachment 12 - Affidavit of Service Doug Zenner, #13 Service Information Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stromberg, Bentley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiCianni, et al. v. Nez Perce County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant DiCianni
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda DiCianni
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Beck
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nez Perce County
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Havens
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Zenner
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nez Perce County Commissioners
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?