Blackburn et al v. St. Joseph Hospital, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: J.H.B., Shannon E. Blackburn, Heser D. Benjamin and Benjamin D Heser
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital, LLC, d/b/a St. Joseph Regional Medical Center, Valley Medical Center, PLLC, Does I-X, Catalyst Medical Grout, PLLC, Alex B. Watson, M.D. and St Joseph Hospital LLC doing business as St Joseph Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2020cv00366
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/14/2020, which includes filing of Joint Discovery Plan, Preliminary Pretrial Statements, and Statement of Stipulated Facts. SEE Order for further details. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy. (dle)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 and #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kevin J Kuhn, Stephanie A Reedy for St Joseph Hospital LLC. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephanie A. Reedy. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2097230.)Sonyalee R Nutsch appearing for Defendant St Joseph Hospital LLC. Responses due by 9/24/2020 (Nutsch, Sonyalee)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kevin J. Kuhn. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2097218.)( Responses due by 9/24/2020)Sonyalee R Nutsch appearing for Defendant St Joseph Hospital LLC. (Nutsch, Sonyalee) Modified on 9/4/2020 to remove motion for certificate of appealability language since it was chosen in error(alw).
August 18, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Molloy. Please use case number 3:20-cv-00366-DWM on all future pleadings. (st)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy from the District of Montana. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St Joseph Hospital LLC identifying Corporate Parent LifePoint Health Inc. for St Joseph Hospital LLC. (Nutsch, Sonyalee)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Medical Center, PLLC. (Jones, Terrence)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Shannon E. Blackburn, Catalyst Medical Grout, PLLC, Benjamin D Heser, J.H.B., St Joseph Hospital LLC, Valley Medical Center, PLLC, Alex B. Watson, M.D. re #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/16/2020. (alw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Answer of Defendants Alex B. Watson, M.D., Valley Medical Center, PLLC and Catalyst Medical Group, PLLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alex B. Watson, M.D..(Jones, Terrence)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by St Joseph Hospital LLC.(Nutsch, Sonyalee)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shannon E. Blackburn, Benjamin D Heser, J.H.B. Declaration of Service Catalyst Medical Group (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service Dr. Alex Watson, #2 Declaration of Service St. Joseph Hospital, #3 Declaration of Service Valley Medical Center)(Mahoney, Patrick)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued (4) as to Catalyst Medical Grout, PLLC, St Joseph Hospital LLC, Valley Medical Center, PLLC, Alex B. Watson, M.D.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jp)
July 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case was opened as a southern division case and it should be a central division case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:20-cv-366-DCN (jp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2079083.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Catalyst Medical Group, #3 Summons Dr. Watson, #4 Summons St. Joseph, #5 Summons Valley Medical Center)(Mahoney, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn et al v. St. Joseph Hospital, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H.B.
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon E. Blackburn
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heser D. Benjamin
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin D Heser
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital, LLC, d/b/a St. Joseph Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Medical Center, PLLC
Represented By: Terrence Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Medical Grout, PLLC
Represented By: Terrence Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex B. Watson, M.D.
Represented By: Terrence Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph Hospital LLC doing business as St Joseph Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Kevin J Kuhn
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Reedy
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?