Secretary of Labor v. Irwin Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor
Defendant: Irwin Drug, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00161
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secretary of Labor. Irwin Drug, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Meleshinsky, Eduard)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Irwin Drug, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (kt)
April 9, 2021 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected from Northern to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 3:21-cv-00161 for all future filings. (kt)
April 9, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 Order, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard.(jd)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISREGARD SCHEDULING ORDER TRACK: (Standard) - All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by January 21, 2022. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before June 25, 2021. A date for ADR will be determined after the close of fact discovery. All fact discovery must be completed by October 8, 2021. The Court will conduct a telephonic interim status conference on October 22, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 4/9/2021, see corrective entry (jd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irwin Drug, Inc., filed by Secretary of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Meleshinsky, Eduard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secretary of Labor v. Irwin Drug, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Eduard Meleshinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Drug, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?