Friends of the Clearwater v. Probert et al
Plaintiff: Friends of the Clearwater
Defendant: Cheryl F Probert, Forest Service, US and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv00189
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Friends of the Clearwater. (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Friends of the Clearwater. (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Friends of the Clearwater, Cheryl F Probert, U.S. Forest Service re #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/12/2021. (alw)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Danielle Norman on behalf of All Defendants (Norman, Erika)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2021 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before July 27, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forest Service, US, Cheryl F Probert ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2207446.), filed by Friends of the Clearwater. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hurlbutt, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the Clearwater v. Probert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Clearwater
Represented By: Bryan Jack Hurlbutt
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Rebecca Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl F Probert
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Represented By: Michelle Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Service, US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Represented By: Michelle Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?