Arnett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Samantha Faye Arnett
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00311
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons SSA, #2 Summons US Attorney's Office)(kt)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(kt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner shall be allowed to proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Samantha Faye Arnett and counsel for Commissioner of Social Security re #3 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/20/2021. (jd)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #1 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Bryan Konoski for Samantha Faye Arnett Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Statement of Social Security Number by Samantha Faye Arnett This is a sealed document.. (Clark, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR REVIEW , filed by Samantha Faye Arnett. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attorney Verification, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Attorney Verification, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons SSA General Counsel, #6 Summons US Attorney Idaho)(Clark, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Paul L Clark appearing for Plaintiff Samantha Faye Arnett. Responses due by 8/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attorney Verification, #2 Supplement Application)(Clark, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Bryan Konoski. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2251037.)Paul L Clark appearing for Plaintiff Samantha Faye Arnett. Responses due by 8/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attorney Verification, #2 Supplement Application, #3 Affidavit)(Clark, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Faye Arnett
Represented By: Paul L Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?