Perez v. Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Case Number: 4:2015cv00019
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 05:1221
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta shall be substituted for his predecessor, Thomas E. Perez, as Secretary of Labor. Defendant's Motion 53 is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion 44 is DENIED. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall contact courtroom deputy Jamie Bracke within one week following the entry of this Order to make arrangements for a telephonic trial setting conference with the Court to set pre-trial and trial deadlines. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Vacate and Reset Trial 39 is GRANTED and the trial date set for April 4, 2017 shall be VACATED. This case shall be STAYED pending issuance of the ALJ's decision in Weymiller v. Idaho F alls School District No. 91 (No. 2015-CAA-00001). Within 10 days of the issuance of that decision, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dismissing 10 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Idaho Falls School District No. 91 and granting 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by Penny Weymiller. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Susan Brinkerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?