Stevens v. Brigham Young University - Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Lori Stevens
Defendant: Brigham Young University - Idaho and Susan Stokes
Case Number: 4:2016cv00530
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Madison - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 263 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Dkt. 252 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant BYU-I and counsel for the Church shall comply with all conditions, precautions, and sa feguards discussed in this Memorandum Decision and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint statement within 14 days of entry of this order setting out a proposed timeline for proceeding to the final phases of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to seal (Dkt. 253 ) is GRANTED. Exhibit H to the Declaration of DeAnne Casperson (Dkt. 252-10) is ordered SEALED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to compel deposition (docket no. 241 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re 217 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Anne Munch filed by Brigham Young University - Idaho. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to exclude (docket no. 217 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN P ART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that counsel shall submit an agreed-upon schedule for BYU-I to file a rebuttal expert report to Munchs supplemental report. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that plaintiff is entitled to a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition on the Topic #10 contained in the amended deposition notice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion for sanctions (docket no. 202 ) is DENIED without prejudice to the right of BYU-I to raise the motion during trial, as discussed more fully in the Memorandum Decision. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to intervene (docket no. 197 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motions for sanctions (docket no. 170 ) is DENIED as explained above. An evidentiary hearing on the motion shall be set for November 12, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in the Federal Co urthouse in Pocatello Idaho. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the motion to compel (docket no. 158 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the motion to exclude (docket no. 159 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DEN IED IN PART as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the supplemental motion (docket no. 161 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks to reject any discovery into Topic No. 7 listed thereon. The mo tion is denied to the extent it seeks to reject any discovery into Topic No. 6 listed thereon. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER Defendant has properly shielded the Cole Notes from production pursuant to the attorney work product doctrine. Defendant's Motion in Support of the Common interest Privilege (Dkt 119 ) is DENIED. Defendant's Mo tion for Independent Examination of Plainitiff, for an Award of Monetary Sanctions, and for an Extension of the Deadlines (Dkt. 129 ) is GRANTED, to the extent set forth in this decision. Defendant's Renewed Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Waiver of the Priest-Penitent Privilege (Dkt 139 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: BYU-I'S Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Waiver of the Priest-Penitent Privilege (Dkt. 46 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. BYU-I's Motion to Seal (Dkt. 45 ) is GRANTED. BYU- I's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with her Discovery Obligations (Dkt. 47 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The LDS Church's Motion to Intervene (Dkt. 49 ) is GRANTED. The LDS Church's Motion Regarding the Common Interest Privilege (Dkt. 51 ) is DENIED. BYU-I's Motion Regarding Privilege Claims (Dkt. 52 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff Lori Stevens' Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. 55 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. BYU-I's Motion to Seal Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Wade L. Woodward filed in support of the Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with her Discovery Obligations (Dkt. 56 ) is GRANTED. BYU-I'S Motion to Seal its Reply Brief and Supporting Declarati ons and Exhibits filed in Support of its Privilege Claims (Dkt. 69 ) is GRANTED; and Stevens' Motion to Strike Reply Declarations and References to Prior Settlement Discussions (Dkt. 76 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (km)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 30 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Brigham Young University - Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Stevens
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham Young University - Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?