Stanger et al v. Walker Land & Cattle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company, E Bruce Stanger, Michael R Stanger and Kimberly S. Kvamme
Defendant: Walker Land & Cattle, LLC and Vista Valley Ag, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00307
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly S. Kvamme, Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company, E Bruce Stanger, Michael R Stanger.(Schuster, Lance)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Enforce Plan Injunction Stephen K Madsen appearing for Defendant Walker Land & Cattle, LLC, Counter Claimant Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Madsen, Stephen)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Objection to Motion to Remand filed by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A 2012 Farm Lease, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion to Assume, #3 Exhibit Ex. C 4-10-14 Minute Entry, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Letter Objection, #5 Exhibit Ex. E NOH on Letter Objection, #6 Exhibit Ex. F 4-18-14 Brief, #7 Exhibit Ex. G 4-23-14 Minute Entry, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Order on Farm Ground Lease Assumption Motions, #9 Exhibit Ex. I 11-4-14 Brief, #10 Exhibit Ex. J Minute Entries from Confirmation Hearings, #11 Exhibit Ex. K 2-27-15 Minute Entry, #12 Exhibit Ex. L Oral Ruling (3-13-15 Minute Entry), #13 Exhibit Ex. M Confirmation and Assumption Order, #14 Exhibit Ex. N Assumed and Restated Lease, #15 Exhibit Ex. O Notice of Default, #16 Exhibit Ex. P Response to Notice of Default, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q 2-12-18 SAGN letter to WLC, #18 Exhibit Ex. R 2nd Notice of Default, #19 Exhibit Ex. S 5-25-18 WLC letter to SAGN, #20 Exhibit Ex. T 5-31-18 Notice of Termination, #21 Exhibit Ex. U Vista Valley letter of intent to terminate sublease)(Madsen, Stephen)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Lance J Schuster appearing for Counter Defendants Kimberly S. Kvamme, Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company, E Bruce Stanger, Michael R Stanger, Plaintiffs Kimberly S. Kvamme, Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company, E Bruce Stanger, Michael R Stanger. Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lance J. Schuster)(Schuster, Lance)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. (Madsen, Stephen)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 COUNTERCLAIM Answer, Counterclaim and Jury Demand against Kimberly S. Kvamme, Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company, E Bruce Stanger, Michael R Stanger, filed by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Madsen, Stephen)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Removal (Madsen, Stephen)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. (Madsen, Stephen)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC from Seventh District Court, Bonneville County, Idaho, case number CV-2018-3186.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1760206.), filed by Walker Land & Cattle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket, #3 Service Documents)(Madsen, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanger et al v. Walker Land & Cattle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Land & Cattle, LLC
Represented By: Stephen K Madsen
Represented By: Stephen K. Madsen
Represented By: Robert J. Maynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Valley Ag, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sometimes a Great Notion Land and Cattle Company
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Bruce Stanger
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Stanger
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Kvamme
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?