K.M.B. v. Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company
Plaintiff: K. M. B.
Defendant: Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company and Does I-X
Case Number: 4:2018cv00358
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: The 10/23/18 TSC is Vacated Per Doc. 7. Case to be closed. (lc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K. M. B. (Mahoney, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 10/16/2018, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for K. M. B. and Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/29/2018. (st)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Bohrnsen on behalf of Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company (Bohrnsen, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division. Please use case number 4:18-cv-00358-REB for all future filings. (st)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1772952.), filed by K. M. B.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Mahoney, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.M.B. v. Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M. B.
Represented By: Jeffrey McKinnie
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company
Represented By: Andrew C Bohrnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?