Sagastume v. RG Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Luis A Sagastume
Defendant: Does I-X, RG Transportation, Inc. and United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00361
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis A Sagastume. United States Fire Insurance Company served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Faux, Leland)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis A Sagastume. RG Transportation, Inc. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Faux, Leland)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process by Luis A Sagastume. (Faux, Leland)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Fire Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis A Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Summons )(Faux, Leland) Modified on 8/20/2018 (cjs).
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Luis A Sagastume. (Faux, Leland)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RG Transportation, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
August 17, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Luis A Sagastume was filed incorrectly in this case as the require Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The form is available on our website under the District Court tab and then Forms, Fees and Rules. The filing party shall re-submit their Civil Cover Sheet using the event of the same name located under Other Documents.(cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RG Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1774362.), filed by Luis Sagastume. (Attachments: #1 Summons )(Faux, Leland) Modified on 8/17/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagastume v. RG Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RG Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A Sagastume
Represented By: Leland Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?