United States of America v. Pelton

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jimmie Lee Pelton
Case Number: 4:2018cv00381
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Dkt. #4 - THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Default Judgment is entered against Defendant Jimmie Lee Pelton in favor of the United States of America for: (1) the amount of $54,952.79; (2) post-judgment interest accruing at the applicable rate; and (3) costs, including the $350 filing fee under 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). FURTHERMORE, the Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to close this case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jimmie Lee Pelton(cjs)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant James Schaefer appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 10/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, James)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jimmie Lee Pelton served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Schaefer, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jimmie Lee Pelton. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jimmie Lee Pelton, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Schaefer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Lee Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?