Rasmussen et al v. Dick Irvin, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Zachary Rasmussen and Sandee Rasmussen
Defendant: Dick Irvin, Inc. and Ronald C. Duncan
Case Number: 4:2018cv00387
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Zachary Rasmussen Notice of Association of Counsel (Hepworth, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for October 18, 2018 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill is vacated. The hearing will be reset by a separate notice. (jlb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dick Irvin, Inc.. (Scanlan, Kevin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dick Irvin, Inc., Ronald C. Duncan.(Scanlan, Kevin)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 02:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 10/11/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Dick Irvin, Inc., Ronald C. Duncan, Sandee Rasmussen, Zachary Rasmussen re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/5/2018. (jp)
August 30, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Dick Irvin, Inc. served on 8/30/2018; Ronald C. Duncan served on 8/30/2018. ( service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick Irvin, Inc., Ronald C. Duncan from Cassia County, Idaho, case number CV16-18-00885.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1780433.), filed by Dick Irvin, Inc., Ronald C. Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons Dick Irvin, Inc., #4 Summons Ronald Duncan, #5 Acceptance of Service, #6 iCourt docket report of 8-30-18 of Cassia County case)(Aldridge, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen et al v. Dick Irvin, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Irvin, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald C. Duncan
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Rasmussen
Represented By: William A Parsons
Represented By: Randolph C Stone
Represented By: J. Grady Hepworth
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandee Rasmussen
Represented By: William A Parsons
Represented By: Randolph C Stone
Represented By: J. Grady Hepworth
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?