United States of America v. Holm et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Cody James Holm and Whitney A. Holm
Case Number: 4:2018cv00423
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Whitney A. Holm waiver sent on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Cody James Holm waiver sent on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Woychick, Nicholas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cody James Holm, Whitney A. Holm. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Whitney A. Holm)(cjs)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Cover Sheet, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Woychick, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Holm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody James Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney A. Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?