Holmes v. Bannock County Jail

Petitioner: Steven Ivan Holmes
Respondent: Bannock County Jail
Case Number: 4:2018cv00445
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:18-cv-445-BLW. (jp)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. 1) is GRANTED. Petitioner may pay the $5.00 filing fee when and as he can afford to do so. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner may file a supplement to his Petition, setting forth the reasons why Petitioner believes that his Petition is not subject to dismissal. This case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bannock County Jail, Steven Ivan Holmes re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/14/2018. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven Ivan Holmes.(cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Ivan Holmes. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Steven Ivan Holmes. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Bannock County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Ivan Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bannock County Jail
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?