Branch v. Bannock County Sheriff

Petitioner: Malachi A Branch
Respondent: Bannock County Sheriff
Case Number: 4:2018cv00493
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
0 Judge: Ronald E Bush
1 Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Petitioner has requested in forma pauperis status. Good cause appearing, Petitioners Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee when Petitioner next receives funds in Petitioners jail trust account. 2. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner must file supplement as described above. If Petitioner does not file a timely supplement, or if the supplement fails to show that the Courts procedural default analysis is incorrect, the Court may dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:18-cv-00493-BLW. (cjs)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - Because not all named parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this case in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73, IT IS ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Malachi A Branch, re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/4/2019. (jp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Malachi A Branch.(jp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Malachi A Branch. Responses due by 11/26/2018 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. Bannock County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bannock County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malachi A Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?