Christianson et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jon L and Wei S Christianson, W Michael Humphreys, H Hook LLC, Wesley Wills, Melbourne J. Jensen Family Trust, Hans L and Mary S Carstensen III, Melbourne H. Jensen Family Trust, Wei S Christianson, Jon L Christianson, Mary S. Carstensen and Hans L Carstensen, III
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00519
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. This case is hereby stayed in accordance with General Order No. 339. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (km)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melbourne H. Jensen Family Trust, Wei S Christianson, W Michael Humphreys, H Hook LLC, Hans L Carstensen, III, Jon L Christianson, Mary S. Carstensen. United States of America served on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barker, Albert)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 26, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:18-cv-519-DCN (alw)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H Hook LLC. (Barker, Albert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1813893.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Barker, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christianson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon L and Wei S Christianson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Michael Humphreys
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H Hook LLC
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Wills
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melbourne J. Jensen Family Trust
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans L and Mary S Carstensen III
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melbourne H. Jensen Family Trust
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei S Christianson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon L Christianson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S. Carstensen
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans L Carstensen, III
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: David P Claiborne
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?