Arriwite v. SME Steel Contractors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel C. Arriwite
Defendant: SME Steel Contractors, Inc. and SME John Does I-V
Case Number: 4:2018cv00543
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 3/21/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SME Steel Contractors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SME Industries, Inc. for SME Steel Contractors, Inc... (Hobbs, Lincoln)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SME Steel Contractors, Inc..(Hobbs, Lincoln)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Daniel C. Arriwite, SME Steel Contractors, Inc. re #5 Stipulation, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/18/2019. (cjs)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the stipulation filed by the parties in this case (Dkt. #5 ), the same is hereby GRANTED. Defendant SME Steel Contractors shall have until January 18, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension to Respond by SME Steel Contractors, Inc.. (Hobbs, Lincoln)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel C. Arriwite. SME Steel Contractors, Inc. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Davis, Patrick)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel C. Arriwite. SME Steel Contractors, Inc. served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Davis, Patrick)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SME Steel Contractors, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(cjs)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SME Steel Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1820724.), filed by Daniel C. Arriwite. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Davis, Patrick) Modified on 12/7/2018 to correct docket text (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriwite v. SME Steel Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SME Steel Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Lincoln Wray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SME John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C. Arriwite
Represented By: Patrick James Davis
Represented By: Mark A. Echohawk
Represented By: Patrick J. Davis
Represented By: Mark Andrew Echo Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?