Ice Castles, LLC v. LaBelle Lake Ice Palace, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ice Castles, LLC
Defendant: LaBelle Lake Ice Place, LLC, LaBelle Lake, LaBelle Lake LLC and LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00571
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Seal Response to the Motion for Bond filed by LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC(an Idaho limited liability company), LaBelle Lake LLC. Replies due by 3/5/2019.(Bateman, Randall)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Bond filed by LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/20/2019.(Bateman, Randall)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 Defendants ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, Claim 1, COUNTERCLAIM against Ice Castles, LLC by LaBelle Lake LLC, LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daily Herald, #2 Exhibit B - Flickr Photos, #3 Exhibit C - Flying Wrench Website, #4 Exhibit D - Ice Castle Website, #5 Exhibit E - Zermatt Resort Website, #6 Exhibit F - KSL News Segment, #7 Exhibit G1 - KSL Website, #8 Exhibit G2 - KSL Website Continued, #9 Exhibit H- Ken Krogue Blog, #10 Exhibit I - '042 Patent, #11 Exhibit J -Cease and Desist Letter, #12 Exhibit K - Second Cease and Desist Letter, #13 Exhibit L - Response to Cease and Desist, #14 Exhibit M - Second Response to Cease and Desist, #15 Exhibit N - Alaska Alpine Club Website, #16 Exhibit O - St. Paul Winter Festival Video, #17 Exhibit P - Saranac Lake Articles, #18 Exhibit Q - Artic Theme Annotated, #19 Exhibit R - Zermatt Resort Video, #20 Exhibit S - KUTV Video, #21 Exhibit T - Christensen Blog Post)(Bateman, Randall)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss CLaims 2 and 3 Randall B Bateman appearing for Defendants LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC, Counter Claimants LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC. Responses due by 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support 1 - Memorandum In Support - Dismiss Claims 2 and 3, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Youngstrom, #3 Exhibit B - January 17, 2018 Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bateman, Randall)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Bond , #23 MOTION to Seal Response to the Motion for Bond filed by Ice Castles, LLC. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kyle Standifird)(Burton, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Seal Response to the Motion for Bond James T Burton appearing for Plaintiff Ice Castles, LLC. Responses due by 3/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Burton, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Bond filed by Ice Castles, LLC. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kyle Standifird, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent)(Burton, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC. (Bateman, Randall)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ice Castles, LLC re Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service, for First Amended Complaint [DKT. No. 19] (Burton, James)
February 6, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #19 Amended Complaint, filed by Ice Castles, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case as it pertains to the Certificate of Service only. The filing party SHALL REFER to ECF Procedure 8 and re-submit their correct certificate of service using Certificate of Service located under Service of Process and link to the docket entry.(cjs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC, filed by Ice Castles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Idaho State Journal, #3 Exhibit C - Fox 13, #4 Exhibit D - Local News, #5 Exhibit E - KID, #6 Exhibit F - Comments, #7 Exhibit G - Facebook)(Burton, James)
February 6, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #18 Amended Document, filed by Ice Castles, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The filing party shall re-submit their filing using the correct event of "Amended Complaint" located under Complaints, Other Initiating Documents.The entry was also filed incorrectly in this case as it pertains to the Certificate of Service only as it missing since the defendants have appeared in the case. The filing party shall refer to ECF Procedure 8 and submit their correct certificate of service when they correctly file the Amended Complaint.(cjs)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ice Castles, LLC. Amendment to #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Idaho State Journal Article, #3 Exhibit C - Fox 13 News, #4 Exhibit D - Local News, #5 Exhibit E - KID, #6 Exhibit F - Comment, #7 Exhibit G - Facebook)(Burton, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ice Castles, LLC, LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC re #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/8/2019. (cjs)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Bond Randall B Bateman appearing for Defendants LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of James Youngstrom, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,511,042, #4 Exhibit C- Cease and Desist Letters, #5 Exhibit D- Reply Letters, #6 Exhibit E - File Wrapped for '042 Patent, #7 Exhibit F - KUTV 2 News, #8 Exhibit G - 3rd Reply, #9 Exhibit H - Blumburg Patent Costs, #10 Exhibit I - AIPLA Economic Survey, #11 Exhibit J- Attorneys' Fees in Sub Zero v. Nye, #12 Exhibit K - Definitions of Icicles, #13 Exhibit L - Matthews Declaration, #14 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Bateman, Randall)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan deadline set for 3/18/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 09:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LaBelle Lake LLC, LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daily Herald, #2 Exhibit B - Flikr Photographs, #3 Exhibit C - Flying Wrench Pages, #4 Exhibit D - Christensen Blog, #5 Exhibit E - Zermatt Resport Webpage, #6 Exhibit F - KSL News Segment, #7 Exhibit G - KSL Website, #8 Exhibit H - Ken Krogue Blog, #9 Exhibit I - U.S. Patent No. 8,511,042, #10 Exhibit J - First Cease and Desist, #11 Exhibit K - Second Cease and Desist, #12 Exhibit L - Response to Cease and Desist, #13 Exhibit M - Redacted Second Response to Cease and Desist, #14 Exhibit N - Alaskan Alpine Club Website, #15 Exhibit O - St. Paul Winter Festival, #16 Exhibit P - Lake Saranac Articles, #17 Exhibit Q - Arctic Theme Annotated, #18 Exhibit R - Zermatt Resort Video)(Bateman, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall B Bateman on behalf of All Defendants (Bateman, Randall)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ice Castles, LLC. (Burton, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Joshua S. Rupp for Ice Castles, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James T. Burton for Ice Castles, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Joshua S. Rupp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1829871.)David Paul Gardner appearing for Plaintiff Ice Castles, LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2019 (Gardner, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James T. Burton. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1829864.)David Paul Gardner appearing for Plaintiff Ice Castles, LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2019 (Gardner, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ice Castles, LLC. LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Gardner, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Robert Dennis on 01/02/2019, filed by Ice Castles, LLC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ice Castles, LLC. LaBelle Lake LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Gardner, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent number 8,511,042 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 complaint) (jp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC, LaBelle Lake LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Amended Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Ice Castles, LLC. (jp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 ERRATA by Plaintiff Ice Castles, LLC re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to Complaint. (Gardner, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1828209.), filed by Ice Castles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to LaBelle Lake Ice Castles, LLC, #3 Summons Summons to LaBelle Lake, LLC)(Mathews, Jetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ice Castles, LLC v. LaBelle Lake Ice Palace, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaBelle Lake Ice Place, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaBelle Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaBelle Lake LLC
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Represented By: John David Oborn
Represented By: Randall B Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaBelle Lake Ice Palace LLC
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Represented By: John David Oborn
Represented By: Randall B Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ice Castles, LLC
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Represented By: Joshua S Rupp
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: James T Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?