Schwartz et al v. Keystone Freight Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Nikki Schwartz and Justin R Schwartz
Defendant: Keystone Freight Corp. and Leonardo Motta
Case Number: 4:2019cv00057
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 6/18/2019. Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. Mediation shall take place by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Justin R Schwartz, Nikki Schwartz. (Beck, Joel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin R Schwartz, Nikki Schwartz. All Defendants. (Beck, Joel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/18/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
March 5, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-00057-DCN. (cjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(cjs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Keystone Freight Corp. and Leonardo Motta's ANSWER to Complaint by Keystone Freight Corp..(Orler, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 3/11/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Keystone Freight Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal Amended. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons Keystone, #4 Exhibit D - Summons Motta, #5 Exhibit E- Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - DQ Motion, #7 Exhibit G - DQ Order, #8 Exhibit H - Order of Reference, #9 Exhibit I - Administrative Order, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Docket)(Orler, Mark)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone Freight Corp.. (Orler, Mark)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Keystone Freight Corp., Leonardo Motta, Justin R Schwartz, Nikki Schwartz re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/16/2019. (jp)
February 14, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Keystone Freight Corp. served on 2/14/2019; Leonardo Motta served on 2/14/2019. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oneida County, case number CV36-19-2.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1848964.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet)(Orler, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz et al v. Keystone Freight Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Freight Corp.
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Motta
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Schwartz
Represented By: Joel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin R Schwartz
Represented By: Joel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?