Endobiogenics, Inc. v. Chahine

Plaintiff: Endobiogenics, Inc.
Defendant: Abi Chahine
Case Number: 4:2019cv00096
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Endobiogenics, Inc. re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Watkins, Elijah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Plaintiff Endobiogenics, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Elijah M. Watkins ISO Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Watkins, Elijah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Abi Chahine re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Endobiogenics, Inc. (alw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Plaintiff Endobiogenics, Inc.. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Watkins, Elijah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endobiogenics, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #6 Status Report, #3 Summons Issued, #7 Notice (Other), Certificate of Service Upon Dr. Abi Chahine by Huissiers de Justice in Belgium (Attachments: #1 Proof of Translation from French to English)(Watkins, Elijah)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Endobiogenics, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #6 Status Report, #3 Summons Issued Notice of Service Upon Dr. Chahine of the Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service from Huissiers de Justice in Belgium)(Watkins, Elijah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Endobiogenics, Inc.. (Watkins, Elijah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel shall comply with L.R. 4.1 forthwith. (lc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endobiogenics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jumplion, Inc. for Endobiogenics, Inc... (Watkins, Elijah)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Abi Chahine. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
March 25, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case assigned to Judge Bush. Please use case number 4:19-cv-96-REB for all future filings. (jp)
March 25, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-96-REB (jp)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(5)(iii), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abi Chahine ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1864643.), filed by Endobiogenics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Elijah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endobiogenics, Inc. v. Chahine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abi Chahine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endobiogenics, Inc.
Represented By: Anna E. Courtney
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Anna E Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?