Chacon v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: Rocco Chacon
Defendant: Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Paul Gilbert, Brady Barnes, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers, Lee Edgley and john/jane does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2019cv00100
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiff and defendants re #10 Answer to Complaint, #4 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/3/2019. (jd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to State of Idaho and Idaho State Police) Michael J Kane appearing for Defendants Brady Barnes, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kane, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Brady Barnes, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers.(Kane, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocco Chacon. Brady Barnes served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Lee Edgley served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Taylor, Joshua)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Re-Issued as to Brady Barnes, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp) On 6/18/2019 issued summons for Idaho AG (jp).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brady Barnes, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5, #5 Summons 6, #6 Summons 7) (km)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1866490.), filed by Rocco Chacon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Submission of Bonds)(Taylor, Joshua)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING BOND UNDER I.C. 6-610 re: docket no. #2 . IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Rocco Chacons Motion to Waive or Set Bond is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. While the bond requirement is not waived, the Court sets a bond amount at $250. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Waive BondJoshua B. Taylor appearing for Plaintiff Rocco Chacon. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (km)
March 27, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket entry number #1 as the wrong event was used. The document will be re-filed by the Clerk using the correct event of Motion to Waive. Case has been correctly reassigned to a District Judge. (km)
March 27, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-00100-DCN. (km)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 DISREGARD PER CORRECTIVE ENTRY - COMPLAINT Motion to Waive Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1865843.), filed by Rocco Chacon.(Taylor, Joshua) Modified on 3/27/2019 (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chacon v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Graham
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Olsen
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gilbert
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Barnes
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Powell
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sellers
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Edgley
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: john/jane does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Chacon
Represented By: Joshua B. Taylor
Represented By: Quentin W Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?