United States of America v. Moses et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Randy A. Burnside and C. Lynn Moses
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT * AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/14/2019 09:30 AM (MOUNTAIN TIME) in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. * Mr. Yost shall initiate this call and instructions are contained in Doc. #5. (lc) Mailed to defendants via USPS.
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States of America. (Yost, Landon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America . (Yost, Landon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default against Randy Burnside Landon Monte Yost appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Landon Yost, #2 Exhibit 1)(Yost, Landon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Randy A. Burnside served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Yost, Landon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. C. Lynn Moses served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Yost, Landon)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before 7/3/19. The Court prefers jointly submitted plans, if possible. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to C. Lynn Moses and counsel for United States of America re #1 Complaint, #3 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/12/2019. (jp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C. Lynn Moses.(jp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Randy A. Burnside, C. Lynn Moses. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy A. Burnside, C. Lynn Moses, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for C. Lynn Moses, #3 Summons for Randy A. Burnside)(Yost, Landon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moses et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy A. Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lynn Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Landon Monte Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?