United States of America v. Gem Air, LLC

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gem Air, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00119
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States of America. (Wucetich, Peter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America Joint Discovery Plan. (Wucetich, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/10/2019 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 7/11/2019 09:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. (at)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gem Air, LLC. (Withroe, Carl)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 7/3/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Gem Air, LLC, United States of America re #4 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/9/2019. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gem Air, LLC.(Withroe, Carl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Gem Air, LLC waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Wucetich, Peter)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gem Air, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Penalties against Gem Air, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Wucetich, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gem Air, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gem Air, LLC
Represented By: Carl J Withroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?