Costello v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Kelly Costello
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00156
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Costello. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jack M. Englert, Jr. on May 13, 2019, filed by Kelly Costello. (Arnold, James)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
May 7, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:19-cv-156-DCN for all future filings. (alw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Kelly Costello against Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., filed by Kelly Costello. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Arnold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costello v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Costello
Represented By: James C Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?