Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc. v. Edgecreek LLC et al
Plaintiff: Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.
Defendant: Central Park Apartments, Alisha (last name currently unknown), Mountain Pines ID LLC, All Studio Apartments LLC, Natalie Halle, Heritage BYU Idaho Approved Housing, Christopher Carr, Edgecreek LLC and Adele Pinvises
Case Number: 4:2019cv00163
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. Mountain Pines ID LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. Natalie Halle served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. Edgecreek LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. Central Park Apartments served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. Christopher Carr served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. All Studio Apartments LLC served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Nagy, Ken)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alisha (last name currently unknown), All Studio Apartments LLC, Central Park Apartments, Christopher Carr, Edgecreek LLC, Natalie Halle, Heritage BYU Idaho Approved Housing identifying Corporate Parent MapleGrove Investments, LLC for All Studio Apartments LLC, Central Park Apartments, Edgecreek LLC, Heritage BYU Idaho Approved Housing.. (McCurdy, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Alisha (last name currently unknown), All Studio Apartments LLC, Central Park Apartments, Christopher Carr, Edgecreek LLC, Natalie Halle, Heritage BYU Idaho Approved Housing. (McCurdy, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C McCurdy on behalf of All Defendants (McCurdy, Christopher)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. (Nagy, Ken)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1883160.), filed by Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Nagy, Ken)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc. v. Edgecreek LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Park Apartments
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha (last name currently unknown)
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Pines ID LLC
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Studio Apartments LLC
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Halle
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage BYU Idaho Approved Housing
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Carr
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgecreek LLC
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adele Pinvises
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc.
Represented By: Ken Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?