Bluth v. GMA Investments
Plaintiff: Krysta Bluth
Defendant: GMA Investments, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00191
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Patrick J. Geile re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Krysta Bluth . (Geile, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default Patrick John Geile appearing for Plaintiff Krysta Bluth. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Geile, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Counsel shall comply with Local Rule 4.1. (lc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krysta Bluth. GMA Investments, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Geile, Patrick)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GMA Investments, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GMA Investments d/b/a Summit Receivables ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1892503.), filed by Krysta Bluth. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Geile, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluth v. GMA Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMA Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysta Bluth
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?