Savoye Apartments LLC v. Zions Bancorporation, N.A.

Plaintiff: Savoye Apartments LLC
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00222
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment beentered and that this case be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, as to all parties. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - On August 9, 2019, Plaintiff Savoye Apartments LLC filed a Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Dkt. #14 ). NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that this case be DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Savoye Apartments LLC (Ericson, Maren)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on August 29, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. mountain time. On or before August 22, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (ckh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Gregory S. Roberts for Zions Bancorporation, N.A. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 ERRATA by Defendant Zions Bancorporation, N.A. - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Mayfield, Michael)
July 16, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re #10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Gregory S. Roberts, filed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A. The motion was filed incorrectly. Please refile your motion using the courts "PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION FORM" located on the courts webpage www.id.uscourts.gov. Re-file your motion as an errata so you are not charged again. (jd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Gregory S. Roberts. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1913591.)Michael D. Mayfield appearing for Defendant Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed] Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Gregory S. Roberts))(Mayfield, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Savoye Apartments LLC and Zions Bancorporation, N.A. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/16/2019. (ckh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Mayfield on behalf of Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Mayfield, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jeremy A. Fielding for Savoye Apartments LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Savoye Apartments LLC. (Ericson, Maren)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeremy A. Fielding. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902366.)Maren C Ericson appearing for Plaintiff Savoye Apartments LLC. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Ericson, Maren)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Reed Christian for Savoye Apartments LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John R. Christian. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902157.)Maren C Ericson appearing for Plaintiff Savoye Apartments LLC. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Ericson, Maren)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1901990.), filed by Savoye Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Ericson, Maren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savoye Apartments LLC v. Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savoye Apartments LLC
Represented By: Maren C Ericson
Represented By: Jeremy A Fielding
Represented By: John Reed Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Represented By: Michael D. Mayfield
Represented By: Gregory S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?