Pettis v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrew H Pettis
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00226
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for CMRE Financial Services, Inc. and counsel for Andrew H Pettis re #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/1/2019. (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Barkley Bissell Smith for Andrew H Pettis added. Attorney Ryan Adam Ballard terminated. (Ballard, Ryan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Bonney, Shaun)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CMRE Financial Services, Inc..(Bonney, Shaun)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. DefendantCMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., has an extension of time up to and including July 29, 2019, within which to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Bonney, Shaun)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1903193.), filed by Andrew H Pettis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Cover Sheet)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettis v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew H Pettis
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shaun Richard Bonney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?