YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: KayLynn S Dalebout and YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC
Defendant: KayLynn Dalebout
Counter Defendant: Doyle Beck
Case Number: 4:2019cv00231
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC. (Cooper, Gary)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brennan H Moss for KayLynn Dalebout. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees Blake S Atkin appearing for Counter Claimant KayLynn Dalebout, Defendant KayLynn Dalebout. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Indemnification and Advance of Attorney Fees)(Atkin, Blake)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brennan H. Moss. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1926316.)Blake S Atkin appearing for Counter Claimant KayLynn Dalebout, Defendant KayLynn Dalebout. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Atkin, Blake)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney John David Oborn,Gary Lee Cooper for YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC,John David Oborn,Gary Lee Cooper for YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC added. Attorney Daniel R. Beck and Mark R Fuller terminated. (Cooper, Gary)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs and defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/13/2019. (jd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC by KayLynn Dalebout.(Atkin, Blake)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Dkt. #3 ). No opposition has been raised to the request and the Court finds good cause to grant the same. Defendant's Motion is, therefore, GRANTED. Defendant's Answer shall be due on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Dkt. #3 ). Plaintiff shall file any response to the Motion on or before July 2, 2019. Defendant shall file any reply (if necessary) on or before July 3, 2019. The Court will then decide how best to proceed. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint Blake S Atkin appearing for Defendant KayLynn Dalebout. Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Atkin, Blake)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal #1 by Defendant KayLynn Dalebout . (Attachments: (1) Complaint - Exhibit A (2) State court docket - Exhibit B (3) Request for Discovery - Exhibit C (4) Declaration of KayLynn Dalebout - Exhibit D)(Atkin, Blake) Modified to correctly label each exhibit on 6/21/2019 (jd).
June 21, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and labeled the document name. Please refile the notice of removal under "Supplement" and attach the state court documents as exhibits.(jd)
June 20, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - KayLynn Dalebout served on 6/20/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KayLynn S Dalebout from Seventh Judicial District of the State of Idaho in and for the County of Bonneville, case number CV10-19-1674.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1903504.), filed by KayLynn S Dalebout.(Atkin, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KayLynn S Dalebout
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Fuller
Represented By: Daniel R. Beck
Represented By: John David Oborn
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Represented By: Mark R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Doyle Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KayLynn Dalebout
Represented By: Brennan H Moss
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?